+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.77
- Rules report cal.77
- Reported
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor