+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.744
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.76
- Rules report cal.76
- Reported
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to election law
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor