+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1411b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1411a
- Amend And Recommit To Health
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor