+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.9
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.15
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor