+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to investigations and government operations
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.115
- Rules report cal.115
- Reported
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1333a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor