+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.3
On January 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.2
- Rules Report Cal.2
- Delivered To Senate
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
- Substituted For S6189c
- 3rd Reading Cal.78
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1316c
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1316b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
- Referred To Transportation
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1316a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
January 14, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor