+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.21
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Substituted For S3463
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.289
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
May 18, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor