+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1304a
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.65
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.238
- Rules Report Cal.238
- Reported
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor