+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.240
On December 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.724
- Substituted For S3465
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.224
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Vote
June 3, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor