+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1267d
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.63
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1267c
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.237
- Rules Report Cal.237
- Reported
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 1267b
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1267a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Housing
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor