+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1266c
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1266b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1266a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor