+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Held For Consideration In Codes
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1236a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor