+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.60
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.348
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging