+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.743
On May 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1228a
- Amend and recommit to codes
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor