+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.61
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.222
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary