+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s3955a
- Substituted by s3955a
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.453
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1205a
- Amend and recommit to agriculture
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor