+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3538b
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 1205c
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1205b
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amended On Third Reading 1205a
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.56
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.347
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments