+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.108
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.107
- Substituted For S1865
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On February 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.45
On February 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
March 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2