+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 1169c
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 1169b
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.70
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to finance
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.73
- Rules report cal.73
- Reported
On June 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1169a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor