+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.57
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.380
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor