+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1137d
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1137c
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On February 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1137b
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 1137a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor