+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.114
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2017
- Substituted For S8963a
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.305
- Rules Report Cal.305
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor