+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.122
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.480
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.480
- Home Rule Request
- Delivered To Senate
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
- Substituted For S9011b
- 3rd Reading Cal.2135
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On June 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 11193a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor