+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S768
- Rules Report Cal.598
- Reported
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor