+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.179
- Signed chap.179
On July 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.662
- Substituted for s1987a
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.295
- Rules report cal.295
- Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 1115a
- Amend and recommit to health
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to health
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor