+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 11117c
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 11117b
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 11117a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor