+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S8882a
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.394
- Rules Report Cal.394
- Reported
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 11061a
- Amend And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On June 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor