+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.177
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2144
- Substituted For S8875
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.259
- Rules Report Cal.259
- Reported
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10961a
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor