+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S8844a
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.423
- Rules Report Cal.423
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10935a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Employees
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor