+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.298
On November 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substituted For S7521a
- 3rd Reading Cal.1497
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.253
- Rules Report Cal.253
- Reported
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10781a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor