+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.237
On August 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2014
- Substituted For S8153
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.511
- Rules Report Cal.511
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
- Reported Referred To Codes
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Racing And Wagering
+ − Vote
June 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor