+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.170
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.488
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.488
- Home Rule Request
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
- Substituted For S8658a
- 3rd Reading Cal.1617
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10681a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor