+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.304
On September 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2060
- Substituted For S8392a
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.235
- Rules Report Cal.235
- Reported
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor