+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.689
On December 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1025
- Substituted For S8099
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On February 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.419
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Consumer Affairs And Protection
+ − Vote
May 17, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor