+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.162
On July 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1917
- Substituted For S8054
- Referred To Rules
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.427
- Rules Report Cal.427
- Reported
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor