+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.124
- Rules Report Cal.124
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Banks