+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On September 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.179
On September 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.863
- Substituted For S8523
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.148
- Rules Report Cal.148
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Vote
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor