+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading (t) 1056a
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.552
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.494
- Rules report cal.494
- Reported
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to codes
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor