+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.469
On November 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Substituted For S8036a
- 3rd Reading Cal.1858
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.380
- Rules Report Cal.380
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10558a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Vote
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor