+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.468
On December 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2063
- Substituted For S8638
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.1056
- Reported
On May 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 20, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3