+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.377
- Approval Memo.69
On December 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted For S8450c
- 3rd Reading Cal.908
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly
- Delivered To Senate
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Rules Report Cal.208
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.208
On July 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 10500c
On July 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On July 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On July 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 10500b
On June 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 10500a
On May 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor