+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 1041a
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.61
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to consumer protection
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.28
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to economic development
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor