+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S7910a
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.371
- Rules Report Cal.371
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10389a
- Amend And Recommit To Real Property Taxation
On May 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor