+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.83
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1190
- Substituted For S7594a
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.250
- Rules Report Cal.250
- Reported
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor