+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.466
On November 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1331
- Substituted For S7913b
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.248
- Rules Report Cal.248
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 10365b
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10365a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor