+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.161
On July 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1325
- Substituted For S8324
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.850
On May 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 14, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor