+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.312
- Rules Report Cal.312
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor