+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5858b
On June 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.209
- Rules Report Cal.209
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor