+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10354b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10354a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor