+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6886d
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.327
- Rules Report Cal.327
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Ways And Means
On July 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10340b
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On May 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 10340a
- Amend And Recommit To Election Law
On April 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law